FORESTDALE RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a Community Centre for the benefit of the people of Forestdale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 October 1978: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2009: Standard registration
- THE FRA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Tymon | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Robert Douglas | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Haworth | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.58k | £109.62k | £236.87k | £280.93k | £336.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.94k | £164.41k | £254.38k | £280.85k | £324.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/01/1974 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/1978 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2010
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FORESTDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHIN A RADIUS OF ONE MILE OF FORESTDALE FORUM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAS RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANGAGE OR TO CO-ORPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Forum Community Centre
Bardolph Avenue
CROYDON
CR0 9BG
- Phone:
- 02086512484
- Email:
- Forestdaleforum@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window