Slovenian Catholic Chaplaincy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing pastoral care for Slovenian community in the United Kingdom. Provide opportunity to worship in Slovenian language. Administer the sacraments. Travel to main centres of Slovenian presence in England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 1978: Standard registration
- THE SLOVENIAN CATHOLIC MISSION (Working name)
- THE SLOVANIAN AND YUGOSLAVIAN ROMAN CATHOLIC CHAPLAINCY (Previous name)
- THE SLOVENIAN AND YUGOSLAVIAN ROMAN CATHOLIC CHAPLAINCY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Susnik | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Taljat | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valentina Osolnik | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marko Istenic | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.61k | £24.94k | £57.57k | £39.65k | £39.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.85k | £24.34k | £56.85k | £35.68k | £35.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 1978 AS VARIED BY SCEME OF THE 21ST SEPTEMBER 1989 as amended on 16 May 2019
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG OR IN CONNECTION WITH PERSONS OF YUGOSLAV DESCENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 OFFLEY ROAD
LONDON
SW9 0LS
- Phone:
- 02077356655
- Email:
- info@skm-london.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window