THE DEVON CHURCH BELL RESTORATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH BELL RESTORATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 27 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HIRD | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Christopher Cleave | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alena Wardle | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY DEEM | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE GRANT | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN VERNON JAMES SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM MAURICE SHARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.76k | £22.33k | £15.45k | £18.98k | £21.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.03k | £7.78k | £8.00k | £33.53k | £6.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 10 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHURCHES IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND DIOCESE OF EXETER FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESTORING, MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING THEIR BELL INSTALLATIONS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DEVON AND THE DIOCESE OF EXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
7A Salterton Road
EXMOUTH
Devon
EX8 2BR
- Phone:
- 01395272444
- Email:
- dcbrf72@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window