THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides a main hall, meeting rooms and sports facilities for the benefit of the local community. It manages and maintains these for the use of groups, organisations and individuals, including use for meetings, lectures, classes and other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving the condition of life in Broughton.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £47,228
Total expenditure: £40,370

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Wobschall Chair 20 January 2025
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Claire Tilley Trustee 20 January 2025
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Michael Richard Smith Trustee 20 January 2025
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Laura Groom Trustee 03 April 2024
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Mark Coster Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
TRIVENA FLECKNEY Trustee 14 August 2023
None on record
Charlotte Bodicoat Trustee 12 December 2022
KETTERING STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Mark Malitskie Trustee 12 December 2022
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Ros Gresham Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Andrew John Tempest Trustee 13 January 2021
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Ravi Zutshi Trustee 12 October 2020
THE BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELDS AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION CIO
Recently registered
Simon Aston Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Barbara Zutshi Trustee 20 September 2016
None on record
PAT SCOUSE Trustee 08 September 2015
None on record
Bryony Gates Trustee 09 June 2015
None on record
CLIVE GRESHAM Trustee 06 January 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.36k £64.00k £48.23k £51.61k £47.23k
Total expenditure £35.82k £53.35k £34.79k £42.14k £40.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £25.49k £10.67k £5.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59 Carter Avenue
Broughton
KETTERING
Northamptonshire
NN14 1LY
Phone:
01536791893