ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society is an independent non-political organisation representing the interests of those living or working in Tunbridge Wells. It is dedicated to the conservation and improvement of the town and its quality of life. It vets planning applications and makes representations to local and national government. It promotes interest and research in local history, on which it publishes monographs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 25 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL AVIS | Chair | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Morrice | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stewart Weller | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Pigache | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheelagh Caroline Auckland | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||
PETER LEWIS | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LORNA BLACKMORE | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lippard | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|||||
David Wright | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
John DeLucy | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ALASTAIR TOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SANDFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.94k | £7.38k | £12.22k | £11.75k | £12.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.17k | £5.68k | £14.72k | £14.76k | £14.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 OCTOBER 1973 AS AMENDED, 10 OCTOBER 1985 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO SECURE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (D)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 ST. JAMES ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN1 2LB
- Phone:
- 01892 522025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window