THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR JAPANESE STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity holds an annual conference at one of the universities in the UK, and it also supports the production of an academic journal, Japan Forum, which is published 3 times a year. It also supports Japanese-studies scholars by way of awards of up to --ú1,500 for postgraduate students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 September 1973: Standard registration
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR JAPANESE STUDIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Perkins | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Russelle Meade | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Francis Kornicki | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam Bamkin | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher James Hayes | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fabio Raphael Gygi | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Coates | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Lucy Elizabeth Osborne | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mara Patessio | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.00k | £65.66k | £68.50k | £63.50k | £50.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.50k | £65.48k | £55.04k | £60.79k | £68.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH JUNE 1974 AS AMENDED DECEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE JAPANESE STUDIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY STIMULATING TEACHING AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
B405
SOAS University of London
London
WC1H 0XG
- Phone:
- 02078984844
- Email:
- bajs@bajs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window