THE CHANDLERS FORD DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Guide Association is the leading charity for girls and young women in the UK. We provide space for girls and young women to be themselves, have fun, build brilliant friendships and gain valuable life skills. We build girls' confidence and raise their aspirations. We give them the chance to discover their full potential and encourage them to be a powerful force for good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
103 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 October 1978: Standard registration
- 14 March 2022: Funds received from 292575 ROTARY CLUB OF ITCHEN VALLEY
- GIRLGUIDING CHANDLERS FORD DIVISION (Working name)
- THE CHANDLERS FORD DISTRICT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE CHANDLERS FORD DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE CHANDLERS FORD DIVISION OF THE GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Walton | Chair | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Phillips | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.44k | £37.69k | £27.92k | £27.40k | £69.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.05k | £27.06k | £32.17k | £19.85k | £68.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Lodge Hill
Newtown
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO17 6LQ
- Phone:
- 07738596493
- Email:
- Zippyzoe42@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window