Financial history WOODBRIDGE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 276627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £18.58k £4.43k £24.17k £25.26k £47.67k
Total expenditure £15.37k £6.23k £27.36k £15.61k £26.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £500