THE BRITISH FEDERATION OF FILM SOCIETIES

Charity Number: 276633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support, sustain and develop the community cinema movement in the UK and to deliver public value to community cinema audiences throughout the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £259,866
Total expenditure: £314,184

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • B F F S (Working name)
  • BFFS (Working name)
  • CINEMA FOR ALL (Working name)
  • FILM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Marie Roberts Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Carmen Chloie Paddock Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Patrick Francis Campbell Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Rui Jin Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
Paula Stott Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
Benjamin Mark Johnson Trustee 14 February 2022
None on record
Andrew Ormston Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Rico Raymond Kevin Lloyd Johnson-Sinclair Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £266.21k £262.66k £271.82k £307.44k £259.87k
Total expenditure £317.18k £273.05k £248.37k £337.26k £314.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.74k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BFFS
UNIT 411 THE WORKSTATION
15 PATERNOSTER ROW
SHEFFIELD
S1 2BX
Phone:
01142210314