UNITED ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 276636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide general community services including prayers, advice, education, wedding and assistance in Muslim burials. To provide assistance to other charities and good causes organisations. Both in the UK and abroad.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,077
Total expenditure: £1,864

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UIA(UK) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ms H Ali Trustee 26 April 2014
None on record
NAZIM BAKSH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.44k £1.44k £3.34k £560 £1.08k
Total expenditure £10.39k £950 £1.07k £1.60k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 Rowland Hill Avenue
LONDON
N17 7LU
Phone:
07985410113
Website:

No information available