THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MISSION STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IAMS is an international inter-confessional and interdisciplinary professional society for the scholarly study of Christian witness and its impact in the world, with over 500 individual and corporate members around the world. Its journal, Mission Studies, is published three times a year. International conferences are held every 4 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Bright Myeong-Seok Lee | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel James Rooms | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bokyoung Park | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.38k | £13.08k | £25.94k | £9.88k | £16.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.64k | £7.92k | £23.54k | £24.05k | £14.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUG 1978 AS AMENDED ON 28 JAN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 03 AUG 2004 AS AMENDED ON 15 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE SCHOLARLY STUDY OF THEOLOGICAL, HISTORICAL AND PRACTICAL QUESTIONS RELATING TO THE THE CHURCH B) TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING MISSION AMONG ALL THOSE ENGAGED IN SUCH STUDIES AND AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC C) TO RELATE STUDIES IN MISSION TO STUDIES IN THEOLOGICAL AND OTHER DISCIPLINES, THROUGH THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF INTERDISCIPLINARY RESEARCH PROGRAMMES AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS D) TO PROMOTE FELLOWSHIP, COOPERATION AND MUTUAL ASSISTANCE IN MISSION STUDIES, ESPECIALLY AMONG NATIONAL, REGIONAL AND DENOMINATIONAL MISSION STUDY ASSOCIATIONS AND EQUIVALENTS E) TO ORGANISE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCES OF MISSIOLOGISTS F) TO ENCOURAGE THE CREATION OF CENTRES OF RESEARCH G) TO STIMULATE PUBLICATIONS IN THE AREA OF THE ASSOCIATION'S INTEREST, INCLUDING AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL AND BIBLIOGRAPHY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chancellors House
23 St. Martins
LEICESTER
LE1 5DE
- Phone:
- 07920 292956
- Email:
- iams@missionstudies.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window