Financial history LAWRENCE HOUSE MUSEUM

Charity number: 276656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.53k £69.77k £48.94k £31.03k £26.48k
Total expenditure £22.71k £34.68k £42.84k £45.58k £35.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.04k £62.00k £42.00k £25.00k £25.00k