Financial history HAVERING AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB

Charity number: 276659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £17.78k £8.66k £11.96k £9.69k £6.58k
Total expenditure £10.20k £4.63k £4.78k £3.65k £2.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A