THE MID-SUSSEX YOUTH MARCHING BAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 November 1978: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- MID-SUSSEX SAPPHIRES (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 OCTOBER 1978 AND AMENDED 24 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BAND ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN MUSIC AND THE DEVELOPEMENT OF THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACITVITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
MID-SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window