Financial history ALDERHOLT RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.28k £7.95k £8.53k £8.94k £12.75k
Total expenditure £6.75k £5.91k £8.36k £12.24k £19.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.32k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A