THE WESLEYAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 October 1978: Standard registration
- 10 January 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE WESLEYAN AND GENERAL ASSURANCE SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.49k | £65.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.31k | £76.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 11 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 29 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 29 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 31 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 31 May 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 15 MAY 1992 AND SCHEME DATED 25TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITIES PURPOSES AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window