FRIENDS OF CORTON HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 October 1978: Standard registration
- 22 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.11k | £4.84k | £4.70k | £4.16k | £4.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.17k | £2.35k | £1.48k | £6.38k | £8.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 11 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE LEGALLY CHARITABLE IN BENEFITING AND FURTHERING THE ACTIVITIES OF CORTON HOUSE AND THE RESIDENTS IN THE ACCOMMODATION PROVIDED AT CORTON HOUSE INCLUDING THE MAKING OF GRANTS (A) FOR THE EXTENSION IMPROVEMENT OR REPAIR OF THE PREMISES OF CORTON HOUSE (B) TO ANY ELDERLY RESIDENTS OF CORTON HOUSE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NORWICH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window