ST JOHN'S (BLACKHEATH) WAR MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities activities entail all that is necessary for the provision of accommodation and support for the 2nd West Kent (Blackheath) company of the Boys' Brigade. The company provides a wide range of pursuits for boys and young men in age groups 6-8, 8-11 & 12-17. These include games, sport, marching, bugle band, camping and other outdoor pursuits, first aid and drama. All within a Christian et
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Greenwich
Governance
- 22 November 1978: Standard registration
- THE BOYS' BRIGADE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN SAMUEL MONK | Chair |
|
||||||||
Justin Nevison-Andrews | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
VANESSA JANE LOUISE RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
WILLIAM DONALD MACKENZIE | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Eddie Scrase-Field | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/08/2019 | 06/08/2020 | 06/08/2021 | 06/08/2022 | 06/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.26k | £13.65k | £12.40k | £22.80k | £24.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £11.92k | £8.38k | £0 | £9.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 August 2023 | 18 April 2025 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 August 2022 | 09 October 2023 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 August 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 August 2019 | 10 December 2020 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH MARCH 1934
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING PREMISES AS A MEMORIAL TO THE MEN OF THE PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, BLACKHEATH, WHO GAVE THEIR LIVES IN THE GREAT WAR FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF ANY SOCIETY OR ORGANISATION ATTACHED TO THE SAID PARISH AND APPROVED BY THE OAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE SAID PARISH HAVING FOR ITS OBJECT THEDEVELOPMENT OF TRUE CHRISTIAN MANHOOD.
Area of benefit
PAISH OF ST. JOHN, BLACKHEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boys Brigade Hall
2A Reynolds Place
LONDON
SE3 8SX
- Phone:
- 02088583432
- Email:
- Magish1@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window