WELLINGBOROUGH DISTRICT HINDU ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement, promotion & practice of the Hindu religion, in particular, but not exclusively, by the provision & maintenance of a Temple for the purposes of public religious worship & other religious charitable purpose; to improve social welfare; providing facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 16 November 1978: Standard registration
- HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- HINDU COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- WELLINGBOROUGH HINDU TEMPLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinodbhai Patel | Chair | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHITANSHU DEEPAK MODI | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROHITKUMAR PATEL | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ramilaben Patel | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
VINODBHAI MANIBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
TEJAS RAMANBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bhupendra Mistry | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|||||
DILESH VAGHELA | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Vijay Patel | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nanyas Mistry | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vidhi Anubhai Shah | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JITENDRA MANILAL MAJITHIA - sunil | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHARDA RAMANBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAJENDRAKUMAR PATEL | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
GIRISH RAMANBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pankaj Rambhai Patel | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
UMESH DHANSUKHBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.58k | £154.29k | £211.62k | £147.73k | £161.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.71k | £73.39k | £124.73k | £149.02k | £141.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £56.01k | £27.66k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/1978 AS AMENDED ON 24/02/1979 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/1981 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/1991 AS AMENDED ON 02/02/1998 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT, PROMOTION AND PRACTICE OF THE HINDU RELIGION OR FAITH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY; BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MANDIR FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND OTHER RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellingborough District Hindu
Association
133 Highfield Road
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN8 1PL
- Phone:
- 01933 222250
- Email:
- VMP843@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window