Trustees 29TH ODIHAM DISTRICT (PONDTAIL) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 276768

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Arthur | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Cookson | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Britten | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Taylor | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Emily Smith | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Shrubsall | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Brewer | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Hilditch | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Dewhirst | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Antony Evans | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN EASTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANNETTE MCELARNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.