FRIENDS OF BRISTOL MUSEUMS, GALLERIES & ARCHIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of the public by promoting, supporting, assisting and improving Bristol's Museums, Galleries & Archives through the activity of a group of supporters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bristol City
Governance
- 16 November 1978: Standard registration
- 29 August 2019: Funds received from 275551 THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF THE BRISTOL ART ...
- FRIENDS OF BRISTOL'S MUSEUMS GALLERIES AND ARCHIVES (Previous name)
- THE BRISTOL MAGPIES (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE THURLOW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Raymond Barnett | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Bailey | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stephen John Sparks | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Hibberd | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maurice Avery | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Mary Bailey | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL LEAR | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TOBY PINN | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE BURLTON | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WALTERS | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE MARTIN | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.26k | £73.98k | £91.79k | £47.71k | £249.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.45k | £68.71k | £44.87k | £86.39k | £81.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/10/1978 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2010
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVING OF THE BRISTOL CITY MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF SUPPORTERS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT)
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRISTOL CITY COUNCIL
CITY MUSEUM & ART GALLERY
QUEENS ROAD
CLIFTON
BRISTOL
BS8 1RL
- Phone:
- 0117 922 3571
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window