FAIRSTEAD HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 November 1978: Standard registration
- FAIRSTEAD HOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Felix Wingfield Longford | Chair | 27 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
John Francis Attwater | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
David Day | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Sanderson | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Nicola Mitchell | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Milne | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 05/08/2022 | 05/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79m | £1.82m | £1.96m | £1.96m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70m | £1.74m | £1.93m | £4.56m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.87k | £5.48k | £3.02k | £5.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.78m | £1.72m | £1.93m | £1.95m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.90k | £182 | £4 | £15 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £93.95k | £23.82k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.70m | £1.73m | £1.93m | £1.95m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.70k | £5.28k | £3.65k | £2.77k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.41k | £14.38k | £20.28k | £30.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £6.70k | £0 | £3.65k | £2.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.61m | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY NURSERY, PREPARATORY OR SENIOR SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUST SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS:(SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES FOR POWERS)
Area of benefit
(1) SUFFOLK AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES (2) UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairstead House School
Fordham Road
Newmarket
CB8 7AA
- Phone:
- 01638662318
- Email:
- bursar@fairsteadhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window