ST NICOLAS' GUILDFORD - DOROTHY GROVER TRUST

Charity number: 276803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity operates for the welfare of St. Nicolas Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £98,409
Total expenditure: £66,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST NICOLAS' GUILDFORD : DOROTHY GROVER TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Neil Charles Roberts Trustee 29 September 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICOLAS GUILDFORD
Received: On time
PETER RICHARD OLDROYD Trustee
None on record
David Alfred Coom Trustee
None on record
Iain George Thomas Ferguson Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £93.79k £92.53k £92.28k £84.41k £98.41k
Total expenditure £101.35k £66.14k £63.79k £54.42k £66.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 THE CROSSWAYS
GUILDFORD
GU2 7QQ
Phone:
01483564069
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available