BHS LTD EMPLOYEES TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP AMONGST EMPLOYEES OF BHS LIMITED, THEIR DEPENDANTS AND RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THAT COMPANY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 1979: Standard registration
- 18 August 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 August 2017: Funds transferred to 1171705 BHS TRUST FUND
- BHS EMPLOYEES TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- BHS PLC EMPLOYEES TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- BRITISH HOME STORES - EMPLOYEES TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2012 | 31/05/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.97k | £117.68k | £132.20k | £119.41k | £116.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.13k | £182.01k | £171.53k | £138.90k | £153.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 14 March 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 30 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | 30 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 03 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | 26 February 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | 12 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | 30 March 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1951
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE BENEFICIARIES AN IN FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS BEING BENEFICIARIES AS ARE FOR THE TIME BEING INFANTS.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window