Governing document BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CYTOPATHOLOGY (BAC)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/09/1978 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/1982 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND ART OF CLINICAL CYTOPATHOLOGY BY ENCOURAGING HIGHER STANDARDS IN CYTOPATHOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2. TO ENCOURAGE RESEARCH IN CYTOPATHOLOGY AND RELATED FIELDS AND THE PUBLICATION OF USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.