Governing document THE AMERSHAM SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 1980, 28 OCTOBER 1998 AND 25 OCTOBER 2000 as amended on 29 Oct 2014 as amended on 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE OLD TOWN OF AMERSHAM.(B)TO PROMOTE STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE, CONSERVATION, PLANNING, DESIGN, MAINTENANCE AND USE OF BUILDINGS AND INFRASTRUCTURE COMPATIBLE WITH THE CHARACTER AND QUALITY OF LIFE IN AND/OR AFFECTING THE OLD TOWN OF AMERSHAM. (C)TO ORGANISE LECTURES FOR THE ENLIGHTENMENT OF MEMBERS AND TO ENCOURAGE GENERAL SUPPORT OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
AMERSHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.