Trustees KEWSTOKE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD TRUST
Charity number: 276900

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR KEN HARPER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fiona Hunter | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wheeler | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Farrell | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Claridge | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Smith | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Booth | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shiralee Baxter | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY IRELAND | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY BARRON | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MANUEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DAVID MAYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY HORRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.