THE REISS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This trust is for the support of 'orphaned children in need' by means of small monetary grants. The children should be under the age of twenty-one and bereaved of one or both parents. Generally they will be children in full time education and grants are given particularly to support educational needs or more basic requirements such as clothing costs,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 April 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STEPHEN BUTTS REISS | Trustee | 20 August 1993 |
|
|
||||
EMMA MARGARET STEED | Trustee | 22 July 1991 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH SYLVIA STEED | Trustee | 06 February 1979 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £547 | £553 | £530 | £526 | £507 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £25 | £25 | £25 | £25 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 16TH NOVEMBER 1881
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE BENEFIT AND ADVANTAGE OF INFANT CHILDREN BUT ONLY IF HE OR SHE BE (1) AN ORPHAN BEREAVED OF AT LEAST ONE PARENT OR A CHILD WHO THROUGH THE INFIRMITY OF EITHER PARENTS OR OTHERWISE IS PRACTICALLY RENDERED AN ORPHAN,AND,(2) AN INFANT UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY ONE YEARS AND (3) IN SUCH CIRCUMSTANCES AS TO BE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES IN NEED OR DESERVING OF PECUNIARY ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
171 CAMBRIDGE ROAD
GREAT SHELFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5JN
- Phone:
- 07954053404
- Email:
- sssteed010@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window