THE SUDBURY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running the Sudbury Heritage Centre and Museum and the Sudbury Museum Trust website at www.sudburysuffolk.co.uk/heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 April 1979: Standard registration
- SUDBURY MUSEUM AND HERITAGE TRUST (Working name)
- SUDBURY MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WILLIAM MINTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Edward John Wheeler | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Penelope Anne Grimshaw | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Tibbetts | Trustee | 18 October 2013 |
|
|||||
PETER REDNALL | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY COOPER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHYLLIS ROSEMARY FELTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
David Stanley Burnett | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE EVE HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £122 | £3.28k | £194 | £3.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.75k | £2.75k | £4.85k | £3.60k | £6.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN SUDBURY IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUDBURY AND DISTRICT AND FORTHE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF SPECIMENS OF THE FINE AND USEFUL ARTS, ETHNOLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOLOGY, BOTANY, LOCAL RECORDS, AND NATURALHISTORY; (A) THE EXTENSION, ENHANCEMENT CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND STORAGE OF THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM; (B) THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY, FACILITIES FOR LECTURES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH RELATING TO THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
SUDBURY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 MELFORD ROAD
SUDBURY
CO10 1JU
- Phone:
- 01787371880
- Email:
- david.burnett@uwclub.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window