THE VIOLA TUNNARD FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of bursaries for students at the Britten-Pears Young Artist Programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 November 1978: Standard registration
- THE VIOLA TUNNARD TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNI WAKE-WALKER | Chair |
|
||||||
Roger Hutton Vignoles | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER TIMOTHY TUNNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH WALLACE GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH SILLITO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03k | £885 | £520 | £535 | £682 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £800 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MUSIC BY AWARDING BURSARIES TO BE CALLED THE VIOLA TUNNARD BURSARIES TO BE FROM TIME TO TIME AWARDED IN MANNER HEREINAFTER MENTIONED TO STUDENTS OF THE BRITTEN-PEARS SCHOOL FOR ADVANCED MUSICAL STUDIES.
Area of benefit
SNAPE, ALDEBURGH AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STUD HOUSE
GREAT GLEMHAM ROAD
STRATFORD ST. ANDREW
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 1LW
- Phone:
- 01728602216
- Email:
- jenni@wake-walker.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window