THE HOLT FRIDAY CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In line with our constitutional objectives during 2008 we strove to give members the opportunity to meet in a friendly atmosphere, to offer support (physical, emotional), to enable them to play bingo, listen to talks, occasionally have a lunch out, have a sing a long, meet as a craft group and have a good two-course lunch. There has been a slight falling off of numbers owing to movement into nursi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 February 1979: Standard registration
- 26 July 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 July 2021: Funds transferred to 1179793 HOLT & DISTRICT DEMENTIA SUPPORT
- HOLT AND DISTRICT DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE FRIDAY CLUB (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90k | £13.80k | £13.51k | £14.50k | £1.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.84k | £8.87k | £11.82k | £11.43k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £400 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 29 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/10/1978 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11/03/2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE HANDICAPPED, ELDERLY OR INFIRM PEOPLE RESIDENT IN HOLT AND DISTRICT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE, AND FOR THE PROVISION OF MEALS FOR SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED, WHETHER FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
HOLT AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window