Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER FURNITURE PROJECT (THE SHAKE TRUST)

Charity Number: 276933
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 June 2016 On Time