COLCHESTER FURNITURE PROJECT (THE SHAKE TRUST)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect, store and deliver donated furniture and other essential household items free of charge to disadvantaged families and individuals in Colchester and its environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £12,420 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 11 December 1978: Standard registration
- 15 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHAKE (Working name)
- THE SHAKE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.00k | £63.88k | £58.54k | £41.31k | £61.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.21k | £56.47k | £54.90k | £50.93k | £52.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.42k | £12.42k | £12.42k | £12.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 18 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 04 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 05 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 15 June 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED 24 MAY 1994 AND 4 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF ALL AGES IN THE LOCALITY OF COLCHESTER, IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE UNEMPLOYED TO WORK TOGETHER TO PROVIDE SUCH CHARITABLE RELIEF FOR THE COMMUNITY. B) TO ASSIST SPECIFIC YOUTH PROJECTS WITHIN THE LOCALITY OF A USEFUL AND CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER DISTRICT AND LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window