1ST SAXMUNDHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 276953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of Scouting is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,004
Total expenditure: £7,339

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 December 1978: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 13 July 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST SAXMUNDHAM AND FRISTON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Davis Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Darren James Long Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Steven Henry Burch Trustee 01 September 2024
LEISTON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.55k £20.80k £7.25k £2.05k £5.00k
Total expenditure £5.90k £3.82k £5.11k £6.27k £7.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2025 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Burnt House Farm
Rendham Road
Saxmundham
IP17 2AA
Phone:
01728602622