THE RIDSDALE TRUST

Charity number: 276959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust makes grants to Organisation that will, in the view of the Trustees, help it to meet one or more of its charitable Objects

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £21,754
Total expenditure: £603

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 December 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Bridges FCII Chair 18 May 2015
None on record
Anne Brown Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
ROBIN CLAUDE SAUNDERS MCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.19k £14.94k £17.75k £18.07k £21.75k
Total expenditure £22.69k £22.42k £10.43k £22.29k £603
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
211 Shorncliffe Road
FOLKESTONE
Kent
CT20 3PH
Phone:
01000 000000