ISLINGTON ARTS FACTORY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To remove financial, social and cultural barriers that prevent people from participating in the arts by teaching art, dance and music in carefully set levels of classes and courses and a through a comprehensive exhibition programme that embraces all forms of the visual arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Islington
Governance
- 11 May 1979: Standard registration
- ARTS FACTORY - I A F (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL PATRICK O'KEEFE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JANET ELIZABETH HAMILTON FLEMING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Katherine Gardiner | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.61k | £199.19k | £157.72k | £155.44k | £162.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.11k | £196.47k | £141.07k | £141.03k | £161.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £102.08k | £38.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH OCTOBE 1978 AS AMENDED 18TH JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE TEACHING OF DANCE AND BALLET AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, CHOREOGRAPHY, MUSIC, DRAMA, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISLINGTON ARTS FACTORY LTD
2 PARKHURST ROAD
LONDON
N7 0SF
- Phone:
- 02076070561
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window