MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage local village hall on behalf of village. Hire hall to local groups and schools to allow for educational or recreation activities .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 January 1978: Standard registration
- MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL MAN COMM (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Chapman | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Griggs | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marissa Taylor | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Norman Gibson | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Tidd | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Fox | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Spinks | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wall | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE PETCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD BOON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN HARPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.40k | £21.87k | £10.82k | £9.81k | £11.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.24k | £5.77k | £21.04k | £5.80k | £10.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.71k | £2.82k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 15TH FEBRUARY 1977 as amended on 27 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MIDDLETON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MIDDLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
School Road
KING'S LYNN
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE32 1SA
- Phone:
- 07751899118
- Email:
- p.petch07@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window