THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association is to advance education, particularly religious education, by assisting in the maintenance of the school and providing amenities for and improvements to the school for which the provision is not made out of public funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lewisham
Governance
- 15 January 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Daniel Pennington | Chair | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Lyne | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Providence-Jackson | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Miles | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maia Swift | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Katzka | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Slipper | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Radford | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aislinn McDermott | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Manning | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Meyer | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.96k | £20.16k | £27.90k | £16.98k | £16.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £9.58k | £35.61k | £4.45k | £23.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED DECEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 3RD OCTOBER 1978 as amended on 10 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, BY ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL AND PROVIDING AMENITIES FOR AND IMPROVEMENTS TO THE SCHOOL FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. BARTHOLOMEWS PRIMARY SCHOOL
THE PEAK
LONDON
SE26 4LJ
- Phone:
- 02086998537
- Email:
- friendsofstbarts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window