RECREATION GROUND, MORCHARD BISHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide & maintain 1) open space to allow the general public to play sport & use recreationaly, 2) childrens play area for all ages, 3) tennis court for adults & children, 4) pavillion/shower & changing rooms for anyone playing sport on recreation ground. Funded by activities organized by committee. Disabled toilet facilities available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 02 February 1979: Standard registration
- MORCHARD BISHOP PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Ian Robinson | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Parkhouse | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ezra Jane Moore | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Carolyn Starrs | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Heal | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
HILARY JONES | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Bray | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Watson | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Westcott Gillbard | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Frances Ticehurst | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toni Jackson | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Francis Drew | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
TERRY NOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £34.99k | £19.84k | £87.89k | £21.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.73k | £37.67k | £16.96k | £12.47k | £16.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.57k | £9.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 13TH AUGUST 1959, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 31ST AUGUST 1990.
Charitable objects
A RECREATIONAL GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MONCHRD BISHOP IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF MORCHARD BISHOP
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Clubhouse
Wood Lane
Morchard Bishop
CREDITON
Devon
EX17 6PE
- Phone:
- 01363877523
- Email:
- mbplayingfield@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window