THE QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GIRLS' SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity organises social events at the School involving parents and staff that raise funds for specific School projects and foster good relationships between staff, parents and pupils, thereby strengthening the School community. The Charity also manages a Project Fund supported mainly by monthly giving from parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 15 January 1979: Standard registration
- 23 August 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- Q E G S A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.59k | £18.93k | £8.27k | £16.90k | £11.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107 | £27.28k | £48.20k | £1.18k | £76.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 26 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 08 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 20 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 29 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
THE AREA SURROUNDING QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GIRLS' SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window