728TH SHELF COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 26 February 1979: Standard registration
- 16 August 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE MSD FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST DECEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 31ST MARCH 1981 AND 13TH JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND FOSTERING OF THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS IN GENERAL MEDICAL PRACTICE; THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH IN MEDICINE, GENERAL MEDICAL PRACTICE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS; THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CENTRE IN LONDON OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE ABOVE; (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.