ST JOSEPH'S COLLEGE READING TRUST

Charity number: 277077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St. Joseph's College is an independent day school for girls and boys aged three to eighteen. The school aims to benefit the public through the advancement of education within the Roman Catholic ethos, providing the highest quality of academic tuition and ensuring the development of wider artistic, sporting and social skills in all pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST JOSEPHS CONVENT SCHOOL (Working name)
  • ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL READING TRUST (Previous name)
  • ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL READING TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
  • ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL READING TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jaysukh Shah Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Amy Charlotte Bainbridge Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Rachel Tetchner Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Margaret O'Keefe Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Mary McCallum Robertson Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Simon Wilson Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Prof Francoise Le Saux Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
Paul Adrian Barras Trustee 26 September 2017
None on record
Giles Peter Francis Watson Trustee 07 February 2017
None on record
JULIA FEENEY Trustee 16 May 2013
None on record
SISTER HELEN-MARIE Trustee
SISTERS OF MERCY (COMMUNITY ESTABLISHED AT WOODLEY)
Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days
ANGLO-IRISH PROVINCE OF THE SISTERS OF SAINT MARIE MADELEINE POSTEL
Received: On time
HILARY BUCKLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.56m £6.56m £6.92m £7.75m £8.42m
Total expenditure £6.70m £6.73m £7.16m £7.81m £8.41m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £21.82k £82.31k £67.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.58k £111.52k £21.82k £5.37k £254.85k
Income - Other trading activities £1.03m £60.26k £38.62k £44.68k £31.58k
Income - Charitable activities £5.42m £6.39m £5.86m £7.70m £8.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £5.37k £0
Income - Investment £0 £250 £200 £0 £0
Income - Other £104.14k £0 £995.41k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £9.58k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.61m £6.60m £7.03m £7.72m £8.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £82.82k £135.38k £128.89k £89.22k £100.48k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £1.00k £16.37k £28.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £12.74k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £7.62m £7.31m £7.14m £7.02m £7.04m
Long-term investments £1 £0 £1 £0 £0
Other assets £548.70k £416.68k £459.86k £575.23k £586.47k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.86m £3.60m £3.71m £3.76m £3.79m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 12 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. JOSEPHS COLLEGE
64 UPPER REDLANDS ROAD
READING
RG1 5JT
Phone:
01189661000