GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BARNET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's purpose is to run and maintain the church property which is used for the furtherance of religious and charitable community functions. Such premises are also used by the School to provide education for children professing the Greek faith, although nothing precludes the Trustees from providing places for children not adhering to that faith,if the Trustees so decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 02 January 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARCHBISHOP OF THYAREIRA NIKITAS LOULIAS | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||
NICOS KAROUS | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SAVVA PAVLIDES | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SPYROS SERETIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE C RODOPOULOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDROS COMNINOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CONSTANTINOS KAVADAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.98k | £182.77k | £201.76k | £225.14k | £244.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.65k | £134.42k | £119.94k | £174.07k | £240.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GREEK ORTHODOX FAITH AND GREEK ORTHODOX CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE BOROUGH OF BARNET AND ENVIRONS AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP A GREEK ORTHODOX SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BARNET AND ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Cross and St Michael Church
The Riding
LONDON
NW11 8HL
- Phone:
- 020 8455 7510
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window