THE MANSBRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Southampton City
Governance
- 30 January 1979: Standard registration
- 21 March 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 3RD JULY 1978
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF A COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION FORMED TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SWATHLING HOUSING SOCIETY'S ESTATE AT SWAYTHLING IN THE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SWAYTHLING IN THE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window