Governing document MAIDENHEAD AND DISTRICT ARTS COUNCIL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22ND JUNE 1978 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 28TH JUNE 1979, 21ST JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1997 AND 24 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
(I). TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MAIDENHEAD AREA OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD IN THE APPRECIATION OF AND PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS; (II). TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO THE AFOREMENTIONED PUBLIC FOR THE APPRECIATION AND PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
MAIDENHEAD AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.