CORNWALL WOMEN'S REFUGE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 January 1979: Standard registration
- 24 August 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 August 2006: Funds transferred to 1105270 CORNWALL REFUGE TRUST
- CORNWALL WOMANS REFUGE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 14 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 06 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 06 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN WHO HAVE SUFFERED GRAVE OR PERSISTENT ASSAULT AND BETTERY OR OTHER GRAVE OR PERSISTENT MALTREATMENT BY THE MEN WITH WHOM THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN LIVING AND THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND THE ISLES OF SCILLY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window