GROVE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL IN FOUR AREAS: PHYSICAL, SOCIAL, SPIRITUAL AND INTELLECTUAL. THE OBJECTIVE OF SCOUTING IS TO HELP ITS MEMBERS GROW AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS, AND AS PART OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 January 1979: Standard registration
- 1ST GROVE SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL THOMPSON | Chair | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Tucker | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Joyce Stovold | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Simon Miles | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN IRELAND | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Irving | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Shapland | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ATKIN | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY BEAMONT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA AUDAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.46k | £38.64k | £29.75k | £26.92k | £86.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.29k | £14.06k | £9.30k | £25.27k | £25.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.53k | £17.91k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912 as amended by an Order in Council on 16 Apr 2008
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL IN FOUR AREAS: PHYSICAL, SOCIAL, SPIRITUAL AND INTELLECTUAL. THE OBJECTIVE OF SCOUTING IS TO HELP ITS MEMBERS GROW AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS, AND AS PART OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
VALE OF WHITE HORSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 NOBLES CLOSE
GROVE
WANTAGE
OX12 0NR
- Phone:
- 01235 760889
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window