Accounts and annual returns THE BARCLAY CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 277203
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 09 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 12 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 22 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 22 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 22 June 2005 On Time