Financial history ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION (EAST HAM) LONDON E6

Charity number: 277213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.25k £74.62k £125.27k £83.42k £88.43k
Total expenditure £101.35k £47.29k £63.12k £66.78k £79.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £47.41k £22.79k N/A N/A