DOMESTIC BUILDINGS RESEARCH GROUP (SURREY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seeking to educate the public by recording, research and publication of historical information regarding the development of Surrey's buildings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 February 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN JOHN HIGGINS | Chair |
|
||||||||
John Crane | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ian James West | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID FRANCIS CHALCRAFT | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY HUGHESDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PATRICK BRIAN MOYLE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CAROLINE SARAH FRISBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROD WILD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £2.12k | £2.13k | £2.69k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £1.47k | £3.30k | £1.15k | £7.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JULY 1977 AND AS AMENDED 11TH DECEMBER 1978, 15TH APRIL 1981,19TH APRIL 1986 AND 29 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE STUDY OF TRADITIONAL DOMESTIC ARCHITECTURE, PRIMARILY AND IN AROUND SURREY: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY RECORDING AND COMPARISON OF SUITABLE BUILDINGS OR HISTORIC INTEREST, AND BY SUCH OTHER STUDIES AS MAY CONTRIBUTE TO THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF SUCH BUILDINGS AND TO THEIR RELATIONSHIP TO THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC HISTORY OF THEIR TIMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 MIDDLE STREET
BROCKHAM
BETCHWORTH
RH3 7JT
- Phone:
- 01737842625
- Email:
- Martin-higgins@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window